|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2436.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3279.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2939.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2484.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 677.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 465.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|