Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/11/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 10. | ||
Senate | 12/10/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |