Senate | 02/06/2014 | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Padilla. | ||
Senate | 05/30/2013 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 17. Page 1204.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Padilla. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1204.) | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 1013.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 565.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |