California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB406 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill June 18, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014