|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 213, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1103.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1013.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 406.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|