04/22/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2013. | |||
04/22/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 250.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 224.) (February 27). | ||
Senate | 02/01/2013 | Set for hearing February 27. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/12/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 11. | ||
Senate | 12/11/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |