Assembly
|
08/22/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 6338.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 696.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|