LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB414
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB414
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB414
Action History
Senate
02/03/2014
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
05/08/2013
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 881.) Reconsideration granted.
Senate
03/21/2013
Set for hearing May 8.
Senate
02/28/2013
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Senate
02/21/2013
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
Senate
02/20/2013
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.