Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |