Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2014 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 12/12/2013 | Set for hearing January 14. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2013 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2341.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/15/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2013 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 01/07/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Senate | 12/12/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 11. | ||
Senate | 12/11/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |