Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2014 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 2590.) Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. Set for hearing January 13. | ||
Senate | 01/06/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 2432.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |