LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB425
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB425
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB425
Compare Versions
SB425 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB425 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SB425 Enrolled August 27, 2013
SB425 Amended May 7, 2013
SB425 Amended April 18, 2013
SB425 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB425 Chaptered September 9, 2013
SB425 Chaptered September 6, 2013
SB425 Enrolled August 27, 2013
SB425 Amended May 7, 2013
SB425 Amended April 18, 2013
SB425 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare