Senate | 01/15/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 01/15/2014 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 2598.) | ||
Senate | 01/07/2014 | Set for hearing January 15. | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2013 | Set for hearing July 3. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |