|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 214, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1948.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 2602.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 579.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 405.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|