Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1104.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1013.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 791.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 484.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|