|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 719, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 2168.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 2867.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 772.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 486.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|