Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2962.) Read third time and amended. (Page 2964.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1087.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 789.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing May 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|