Assembly | 04/24/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 06/03/2013 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 969.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 756.) (April 30). | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Set for hearing April 30. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |