|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 277, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 22. Page 2703.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 8. Page 861.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 464.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 325.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Set for hearing March 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|