|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 417, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2402.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2976.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|