|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 2442.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 3195.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 3248.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 32. Page 3043.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Nazarian.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1158.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1014.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 759.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 565.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|