Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 01/08/2014 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 12/12/2013 | Set for hearing January 14. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 08/19/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 641.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |