Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. Set for hearing May 8. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |