LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB460
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB460
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB460
Compare Versions
SB460 Chaptered October 9, 2013
SB460 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB460 Amended September 3, 2013
SB460 Amended August 19, 2013
SB460 Amended August 15, 2013
SB460 Amended August 6, 2013
SB460 Amended May 28, 2013
SB460 Amended April 16, 2013
SB460 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB460 Chaptered October 9, 2013
SB460 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB460 Amended September 3, 2013
SB460 Amended August 19, 2013
SB460 Amended August 15, 2013
SB460 Amended August 6, 2013
SB460 Amended May 28, 2013
SB460 Amended April 16, 2013
SB460 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare