|
08/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 2508.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1156.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1014.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 663.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|