Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/15/2013 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |