Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/30/2014
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 6. Page 2688.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
Set for hearing January 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 666.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|