|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2291.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 3. Page 2999.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2868.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 3. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 756.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|