LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB468
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB468
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB468
Compare Versions
SB468 Chaptered October 9, 2013
SB468 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB468 Amended September 6, 2013
SB468 Amended August 21, 2013
SB468 Amended August 6, 2013
SB468 Amended May 28, 2013
SB468 Amended April 25, 2013
SB468 Amended April 15, 2013
SB468 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB468 Chaptered October 9, 2013
SB468 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB468 Amended September 6, 2013
SB468 Amended August 21, 2013
SB468 Amended August 6, 2013
SB468 Amended May 28, 2013
SB468 Amended April 25, 2013
SB468 Amended April 15, 2013
SB468 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare