|
02/27/2014
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 2971.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 773.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|