California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB476 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2013

Amended

Bill July 2, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013