California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2014

Amended

Bill May 1, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014