Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing May 7. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 16. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |