Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 864.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 817.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|