|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 166, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 2512.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
From consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 577.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 388.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|