California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB483 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2013

Amended

Bill September 4, 2013
Bill August 7, 2013
Bill July 1, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013