California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 3, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 14, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013