Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 664.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/12/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Re-referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and INS. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |