California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2013

Amended

Bill August 8, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013