California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB502 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2014

Amended

Bill June 25, 2014
Bill June 11, 2014
Bill August 7, 2013