LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB51
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB51
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB51
Action History
Senate
02/03/2014
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Senate
09/12/2013
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 2413.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
01/10/2013
Referred to Com. on G.O.
Senate
01/07/2013
Read first time.
Senate
12/20/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 19.
Senate
12/19/2012
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.