|
09/26/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 373, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 24. Page 2849.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 776.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 668.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|