|
07/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2132.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 969.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 757.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|