Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |