Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2013 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 08/15/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1159.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1016.) (May 23). | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Set for hearing May 13. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 695.) (April 24). | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |