07/11/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/11/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 17. Page 2248.) Ordered to the Senate. | ||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 576.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 487.) (April 10). | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 10. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |