Senate | 02/03/2014 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Set for hearing May 23. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 29. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 565.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2013 | Set for hearing April 17. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Set for hearing April 3. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |