Senate | 05/29/2013 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 787.) | ||
Senate | 04/29/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 1. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Set for hearing April 24. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |