Assembly | 08/07/2013 | Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 907.) Ordered to the Assembly. | ||
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2013 | Set for hearing May 6. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 639.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Set for hearing April 23. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |