California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2013

Amended

Bill August 12, 2013
Bill May 16, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013